CA SB1051 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 846, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 846, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.97 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] |
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1051 Dodd Third Reading Urgency By GRAY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1051 Dodd et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1051 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1051 Dodd et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1051 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 846, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6152.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | From consent calendar. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5013.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4784.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19821 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12012.97 | New Code | See Bill Text |