CA SB1044 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 13029, 13061, and 13062 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to fire protection.
Title
Firefighting equipment and foam: PFAS chemicals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1044 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1044 Allen Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1044 Allen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1044 Allen Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1044 Allen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5224.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | July 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3880.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3768.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3621.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 29. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Coms. on G.O., and JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ., G.O., and JUD. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 13029 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13061 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13062 | New Code | See Bill Text |