CA SB1042 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - April 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3519.)
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - April 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3519.)
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 667.1, 667.5, 1170.125, and 1192.7 of the Penal Code, relating to felonies.
Title
Violent felonies: serious felonies: human trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-04-05 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-05-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-05 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-05-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3519.) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | April 5 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 2. Page 3328.) Reconsideration granted. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170.125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1192.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 667.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 667.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |