CA SB1042 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on B., P. & E.D. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on B., P. & E.D. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26012 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 100000, 100002, 100004, 100010, 100014, 100028, 100032, 100034, 100038, 100043, and 100046 of, and to amend the heading of Title 21 (commencing with Section 100000) of, the Government Code, relating to retirement savings.
Title
Retirement savings.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on B., P. & E.D. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and B., P. & E.D. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100014 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100028 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100034 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100038 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100043 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100046 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1042 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1042 |