CA SB1040 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 789, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 789, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 34052 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 12301.1 of, and to add Sections 12304.41 and 12312 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to in-home supportive services.
Title
In-home supportive services: natural disaster.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1040 Dodd Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1040 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1040 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1040 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1040 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 789, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5424.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6311.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and H. & C.D. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4940.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | April 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4624.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 34052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34054 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12301.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12304.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12305.88 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12312 | New Code | See Bill Text |