CA SB104 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 189, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2022 (Chapters, 43, 45, 249 of the Statutes of 2022) by amending Sections 19.56 and 39.10 of that act, and to amend the Budget Act of 2023 (Chapters 12 and 38 of the Statutes of 2023) by amending Items 0250-101-0001, 0250-101-0932, 0509-102-0001, 0530-001-0001, 0540-492, 0650-001-0001, 0650-001-3228, 0650-101-0001, 0690-001-0001, 0690-101-0001, 0690-103-0001, 0820-001-0001, 0845-001-0217, 1700-001-0001, 2240-102-0890, 3100-001-0001, 3125-491, 3360-101-3228, 3480-001-0001, 3540-301-0001, 3600-001-0001, 3600-101-0001, 3790-001-0001, 3790-101-0001, 3790-301-3312, 3790-490, 3790-492, 3850-101-0001, 3860-001-0001, 3900-001-3228, 3900-490, 3940-001-0001, 3940-001-0193, 3940-001-0306, 3940-001-3058, 4140-001-3397, 4140-101-0001, 4140-101-3397, 4260-019-0001, 4260-115-0890, 4300-001-0001, 5180-001-0001, 5180-101-0001, 5180-141-0001, 5180-161-0001, 5227-116-0001, 5227-122-0001, 5227-494, 6100-005-0001, 6100-134-0890, 6100-156-0001, 6100-196-0001, 6360-001-0407, 6440-001-0001, 6870-002-0001, 6870-101-0001, 6980-101-0001, 7100-001-0588, 7120-103-0001, 7502-001-0001, 7502-001-0890, 7870-490, 8140-002-0001, 8260-101-0001, 8260-101-0890, 8570-102-0001, 8940-001-0001, 8940-001-0890, and 9210-115-0001 of Section 2.00 of, adding Items 0250-490, 0509-493, 1111-002-0761, 1111-012-0001, 2240-495, 2245-111-0001, 2740-004-0001, 3100-001-0890, 3355-490, 3790-003-0001, 3790-005-0001, 3790-102-0001, 3860-103-0001, 3900-495, 4140-490, 4140-495, 6440-491, and 8140-101-0001 to Section 2.00 of, amending Sections 19.561, 19.562, 19.563, 19.564, 19.565, 19.566, 19.567, 19.568, 19.569, 35.50, and 39.00 of, and adding Section 39.10 to, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Acts of 2022 and 2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB104 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-08 - Assembly - SB 104 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB104 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 189, Statutes of 2023.
2023-09-13 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-12 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2023-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2568.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-09-08SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2023-09-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 3101.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-09-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-06AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2023-09-06AssemblyWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 2953.)
2023-09-06AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2023-09-01AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-08-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-03-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-03-27SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 486.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-03-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-03-16SenateOrdered to second reading.
2023-03-16SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 357.)
2023-01-25SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2023-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2023-01-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback