CA SB104 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17055 of, to add and repeal Section 17052.10 of, and to add and repeal Part 10.4 (commencing with Section 19900) of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Elective tax: partnership: āSā corporation: credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 632.) (March 25). |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |