CA SB104 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1001 and 1003 of, to amend the heading of Part 4 (commencing with Section 1000) of Division 1 of, and to repeal and add Section 1002 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 14005.18, 14005.40, 14007.8, 14301.1, 17600.50, 17612.1, 17612.2, 17613.1, and 17613.2 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - Assembly - SB 104 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB104 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB104 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB104 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB104 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1726.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 2399.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 8. Page 2390.) |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 672.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1002 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14007.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14301.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17600.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17612.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17612.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17613.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17613.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |