CA SB104 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-23 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-23 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1142, 1151.6, 1156, 1156.2, 1156.3, 1156.4, 1156.7, 1157, 1160.3, and 1160.6 of, and to add Section 1156.35 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Labor representatives: elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Assembly - SB 104 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB104 Steinberg (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB104 Steinberg (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2011-06-28 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2011-06-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2011-06-14 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-05-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 1390.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 13). | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 45. Noes 23. Page 808.) | |
2011-03-31 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-03-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 499.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-03-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-17 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 382.) (March 17). | |
2011-03-15 | Set for hearing March 17. | |
2011-03-09 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 306.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-01 | Set for hearing March 9. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2011-01-13 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12. | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1142 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1151.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1156 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1156.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1156.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1156.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1156.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1156.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1157 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1160.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1160.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |