CA SB1039 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 799, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 799, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 655, 1944, 2733, 2786.5, 2811, 2811.5, 2815, 2815.5, 2816, 2830.7, 2836.3, 2838.2, 4128.2, 4830, 4999, 4999.2, 8516, and 8518 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 4400, 7137, and 7153.3 of, to add Sections 2746.53 and 3030 to, to repeal Sections 4999.1, 4999.3, 4999.4, and 4999.6 of, and to repeal and add Sections 2546.9, 2565, 2566, 2566.1, and 4999.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 1348.8 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10279 of the Insurance Code, relating to professions and vocations, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Professions and vocations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 1)SB1 039 Hil l Con (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1039 Hill Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 51 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1039 Hill Senate Third Reading Amend By BONILLA Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1039 Hill Senate Third Reading Amend By BONILLA Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1039 Hill (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1039 Hill Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 51 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1039 Hill Senate Third Reading Amend By BONILLA Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1039 Hill Senate Third Reading Amend By BONILLA Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1039 Hill (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 799, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5526.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 29. Page 6371.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6274.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 5989.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (June 28). |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4103.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4002.) (May 27). |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3591.) (April 18). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | April 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | March 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. Testimony only. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |