CA SB1036 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 49073.2 to the Education Code, relating to local educational agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local educational agencies: minutes of meetings of governing bodies: release of directory information and personal information of pupils and parents or guardians of pupils.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1036 Wilk (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2018-04-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4759.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4439.) (March 21).
2018-03-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-28SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-09SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code49073New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code49073.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code49073.5Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback