CA SB1035 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 733, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65302 of the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1035 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1035 Jackson Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 56 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1035 Jackson (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 733, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-23 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-05SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 5865.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 23. Page 6578.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 27).
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 4940.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4719.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4623.) (April 11).
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt.
2018-04-03SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-04-02SenateApril 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and EQ.
2018-02-09SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65302Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback