CA SB1034 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 123222.3 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health.
Title
Health care: mammograms.
Sponsors
Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] |
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1034 Mitchell et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1034 Mitchell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1034 Mitchell et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1034 Mitchell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1034 Mitchell et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5689.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6516.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4334.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4851.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 123222.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |