CA SB1030 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bloom.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bloom.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51010, 51010.5, 51010.6, 51011, 51014, 51015, 51015.05, 51017, 51018, and 51018.6 of, and to repeal Section 51012.3 of, the Government Code, relating to pipeline safety.
Title
Pipeline safety: records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1030 Limón (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1030 Limón (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bloom. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 10). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.M. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 3831.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2. Page 3511.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51010.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51010.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51012.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51014 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51015 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51015.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51017 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51018 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51018.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |