CA SB103 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 216, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 216, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6864, 6901, 6906, 6909, 7100, 7300, 7578, 7843, 8550, 8651, and 18002 of, to add Chapter 1.2 (commencing with Section 6911) of Part 2 of Division 6 to, and to repeal Sections 6905, 6907, and 6908 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Uniform Faithful Presidential Electors Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 103 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-27 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB103 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-27 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB103 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 216, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5826.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 913.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 498.) (March 15). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 18002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6864 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6905 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6906 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6907 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6908 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6909 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6911 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 7100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 7300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 7578 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 7843 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8550 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |