CA SB103 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 19829.9848 of the Government Code, relating to state public employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State employees: memorandum of understanding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB103 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 103 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB103 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-07-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2019-06-20SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 1670.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-17SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-06-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2298.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.)
2019-06-17AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-17AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 672.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code19829.9848Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback