CA SB1028 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 411, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 751 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utility rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities: rates: federal tax law changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1028 Hill Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1028 Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 411, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-14 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-22SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6311.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4339.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4240.) (May 22).
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-04-30SenateApril 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4718.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-02-09SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code751New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback