CA SB1026 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1941.8 to the Civil Code, and to add Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 25993) to Division 15 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Residential energy efficiency disclosure statement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1026 Wieckowski (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1026 Wieckowski (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 14). |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and U. & E. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 3836.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3780.) (May 19). |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3509.) (April 26). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3325.) (April 5). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and E., U. & C. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referral to Com. on E., U. & C. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING, JUD., and E., U. & C. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1941.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25993 | New Code | See Bill Text |