CA SB1023 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 14503 and 24005 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to reproductive health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reproductive health care coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1023 Hernandez (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-31AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4405.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4302.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-09SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4745.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-03-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-03-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
2018-02-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback