CA SB102 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-29 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2023 by amending Items 0250-001-0001, 0250-003-0001, 0250-003-3037, 0250-014-3066, 0250-101-0001, 0250-101-0932, 0250-103-0001, 0250-111-0001, 0250-301-0660, 0509-001-0001, 0509-101-0001, 0509-102-0001, 0509-495, 0511-002-0001, 0521-101-0046, 0521-101-3228, 0521-131-0001, 0530-001-0001, 0530-495, 0540-001-0001, 0540-001-6088, 0540-101-0001, 0540-102-0001, 0540-491, 0540-495, 0559-001-0001, 0650-001-0001, 0650-101-0001, 0650-495, 0690-001-0001, 0690-001-0890, 0690-006-0001, 0690-101-0001, 0820-001-0001, 0820-001-0460, 0820-011-0920, 0840-001-0001, 0840-001-9740, 1115-001-3288, 1700-001-0001, 2100-011-0001, 2240-103-0001, 2240-123-0001, 2240-125-0001, 2720-003-0044, 2740-492, 2740-493, 2740-495, 2740-496, 3100-001-0001, 3360-001-0465, 3360-001-3228, 3360-002-0001, 3360-007-0001, 3360-101-3228, 3360-102-0001, 3360-495, 3480-001-0001, 3480-495, 3540-001-0001, 3540-301-0001, 3540-491, 3600-001-0001, 3600-001-6088, 3600-491, 3640-101-0001, 3640-103-0001, 3640-495, 3720-001-0001, 3760-101-0001, 3790-001-0001, 3790-001-0516, 3790-101-0001, 3790-101-0516, 3790-301-3312, 3830-101-0001, 3835-101-0001, 3850-101-0001, 3860-001-0001, 3860-101-0001, 3860-491, 3860-495, 3875-101-0001, 3900-101-0001, 3900-101-3228, 3940-001-0001, 3940-102-0001, 3940-106-0001, 3940-495, 3970-012-0133, 4140-001-3397, 4140-101-0001, 4140-101-3085, 4140-101-3397, 4150-001-0933, 4170-001-0001, 4170-101-0001, 4260-001-0001, 4260-001-0890, 4260-001-3085, 4260-001-3113, 4260-101-0001, 4260-101-0890, 4260-101-3085, 4260-101-3431, 4260-116-0001, 4260-116-3397, 4260-119-0001, 4265-001-0001, 4265-111-0001, 4265-490, 4300-001-0001, 4300-101-0001, 4440-011-0001, 4560-001-3085, 4560-101-3085, 4700-001-0001, 4700-101-0001, 4700-495, 4800-101-3381, 5160-001-0001, 5160-001-0890, 5180-001-0001, 5180-001-0890, 5180-101-0001, 5180-101-0890, 5180-111-0001, 5180-141-0001, 5180-141-0890, 5180-151-0001, 5225-001-0001, 5225-001-0917, 5225-002-0001, 5225-003-0001, 5225-004-0001, 5225-017-0001, 5225-019-0001, 5225-024-0001, 5225-301-0001, 5227-103-0001, 5227-116-0001, 5227-117-0001, 5227-118-0001, 5227-491, 5227-494, 6100-001-0001, 6100-001-0890, 6100-006-0001, 6100-103-0890, 6100-149-0001, 6100-161-0890, 6100-168-0001, 6100-194-0001, 6100-196-0001, 6100-201-0890, 6100-203-0001, 6100-301-0001, 6100-488, 6440-001-0001, 6440-495, 6610-001-0001, 6610-496, 6870-101-0001, 6870-108-0001, 6870-301-6028, 7100-011-0588, 7120-101-0001, 7120-102-0001, 7120-103-0001, 7350-001-0001, 7350-001-3078, 7350-001-3152, 7350-101-3078, 7502-001-0001, 7502-001-9730, 7502-003-9730, 7760-001-0001, 7760-001-0002, 7760-001-9746, 7760-002-0666, 7760-003-0666, 7920-011-0001, 8140-001-0001, 8260-001-0001, 8260-101-0001, 8260-495, 8570-001-0001, 8570-003-0001, 8570-003-0044, 8570-101-0001, 8570-101-3228, 8570-102-0001, 8570-491, 8570-495, 8660-001-0001, 8660-062-0001, 8820-101-0001, 8860-001-0001, 8940-001-0001, 8940-001-0890, and 8955-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of, adding Items 0250-301-0001, 0515-495, 0530-001-3085, 0820-018-0001, 1703-490, 2240-121-0001, 2240-122-0001, 3540-101-3228, 3600-495, 3790-495, 3790-497, 3940-162-8506, 3970-012-3065, 3970-013-3065, 4260-019-0001, 4260-101-3428, 4260-111-3428, 4700-001-3228, 4700-101-3228, 4800-495, 5225-301-0660, 5227-129-0001, 5227-402, 6870-002-0001, 6870-203-0001, 6870-495, 7120-101-3228, 7502-001-0890, 8140-002-0001, and 8660-101-3228 to Section 2.00 of, repealing Items 0250-111-3037, 0515-103-0001, 0521-031-0001, 0521-496, 0540-101-3328, 0690-492, 3125-101-0001, 3360-001-0001, 3540-102-0001, 3760-105-0001, 3760-107-0001, 3810-104-0001, 3825-102-0001, 3845-101-0001, 3855-102-0001, 3900-495, 4560-001-0001, 4560-101-0001, 7350-101-0001, 8570-001-0191, and 8660-002-0001 of Section 2.00 of, amending Sections 11.86, 12.32, 13.40, 19.56, 21.00, 28.00, 35.50, and 99.50 of, and adding Sections 19.561, 19.562, 19.563, 19.564, 19.565, 19.566, 19.567, 19.568, and 19.569 to, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB102 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-06-26AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2023-06-26AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2023-06-26Assembly(Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 2370.)
2023-06-26AssemblyAssembly Rules Suspended.
2023-06-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-03-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-03-27SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 486.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-03-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-03-16SenateOrdered to second reading.
2023-03-16SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 357.)
2023-01-25SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2023-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2023-01-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback