CA SB102 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 30035.7, 65400, 65585, and 65913.4 of, to add Sections 65589.9 and 65589.11 to, and to add and repeal Article 12 (commencing with Section 65660) of Chapter 3 of Division 1 of Title 7 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 50199.8, 50517.5, 50517.6, 50517.7, 50650, 50650.3, 50650.4, 50843.5, and 53545.13 of, to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 50216) to Part 1 of Division 31 of, to add Chapter 3.1 (commencing with Section 50515) to Part 2 of Division 31 of, and to add Part 12.5 (commencing with Section 53559) to Division 31 of, the Health and Safety Code, to add Sections 75218.1 and 75244 to the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 12206, 17058, 17561, 23610.5, and 24692 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Section 8256 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to housing, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing development and financing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB102 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 671.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code30035.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65400Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65585Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65589.11New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65589.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65660Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code65913.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50199.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50216New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code50517.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50517.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50517.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50650Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50650.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50650.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50843.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code53545.13Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code75218.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code75244New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code12206Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17058Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17561Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code23610.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code24692Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code8256Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback