CA SB1019 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 706.6 and 16501.1 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Short-term residential therapeutic programs: postdischarge plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16501.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 706.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1019 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1019 |