CA SB1019 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5848.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to youth mental health.
Title
Youth mental health and substance use disorder services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Dante Acosta [R] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1019 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1019 Beall Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1019 Beall et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1019 Beall Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1019 Beall et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5860.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6591.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4404.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4302.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4717.) (April 18). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4375.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5848.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5920 | New Code | See Bill Text |