CA SB1015 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Division 46 (commencing with Section 80200) to the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources Climate Resiliency Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1015 Allen et al (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-15AssemblyAugust 15 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 18).
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W.,P., & W.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4347.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4302.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-10SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-26SenateApril 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4719.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-03-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4367.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-02-23SenateSet for hearing March 13.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
2018-02-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
2018-02-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code80200New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback