CA SB1015 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal Section 1453 of the Labor Code, relating to domestic work employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic work employees: labor standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1015 Leyva Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, C (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1015 Leyva (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-12 Approved by the Governor.
2016-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2016-08-30SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2016-08-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 5901.) Ordered to the Senate.
2016-08-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 10).
2016-08-03AssemblyAugust 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2016-06-29AssemblyJune 29 hearing postponed by committee.
2016-06-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-05-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2016-04-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2016-04-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 3708.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2016-04-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-04-18SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2016-04-08SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2016-04-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3421.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-03-18SenateSet for hearing April 6.
2016-02-25SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2016-02-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
2016-02-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1453Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1015&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1015_bill_20160211_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1015_bill_20160902_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1015_bill_20160912_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1015_vote_20160406_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1015_vote_20160428_0959AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1015_vote_20160622_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1015_vote_20160810_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1015_vote_20160818_0201PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback