CA SB1014 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 44274.4 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 5431 of, and to add Section 5450 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
California Clean Miles Standard and Incentive Program: zero-emission vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1014 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1014 Skinner Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - ? (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1014 Skinner (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1014 Skinner Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - ? (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1014 Skinner (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 6133.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 7062.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (June 25). |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and TRANS. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 4460.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4302.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 4822.) (April 24). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24 in T. & H. pending receipt. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 4718.) (April 17). |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C., EQ., and T. & H. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44274.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44274.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5431 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5450 | New Code | See Bill Text |