CA SB1013 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 375, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 375, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 39734 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Division 45 (commencing with Section 76000) to the Public Resources Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
Fluorinated refrigerants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1013 Lara et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1013 Lara Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1013 Lara et al (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1013 Lara Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1013 Lara et al (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 375, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 6051.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 6778.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 18). |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4404.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4301.) (May 25). |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 4850.) (April 25). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 4). |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39734 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 76000 | New Code | See Bill Text |