CA SB1013 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Hearing: Apr 25 @ 1:30 pm in Room 3191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 39734 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Division 45 (commencing with Section 76000) to the Public Resources Code, relating to greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fluorinated refrigerants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-04-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 4).
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2018-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code39734New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code76000New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback