CA SB1013 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2985, 2985.1, 2985.2, 2985.3, 2985.4, and 2985.5 of the Penal Code, relating to parolees.
Title
Mentally ill parolees: housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3612.) (April 19). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2985 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2985.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2985.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2985.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2985.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2985.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |