CA SB1010 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 5.5 (commencing with Section 2986) to Chapter 7 of Title 1 of Part 3 of the Penal Code, relating to parole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parolees: Supportive Housing Pilot Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1010 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - [03-20-2018] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4452.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4301.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-16SenateApril 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4418.) (March 20).
2018-03-20SenateMarch 20 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted.
2018-03-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4418.) (March 20).
2018-03-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-06SenateSet for hearing March 20.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code2985.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code2985.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code2985.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code2985.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code2985.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code2986New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback