CA SB1010 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1385.045 of, to add Section 1367.245 to, and to add and repeal Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 127675) of Part 2 of Division 107 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10181.45 of, and to add Section 10123.204 to, the Insurance Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health care: prescription drug costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1010 Hernandez (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1010 Hernandez (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Died on the inactive file. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2016-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 28). |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4099.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4001.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3559.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 127675 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.245 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1385.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1385.045 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10181.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10181.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |