CA SB1010 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 749, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11351.5 and 11470 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 1203.073 of the Penal Code, relating to controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cocaine base: penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1010 Mitchell Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 1010 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By BRADFORD (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1010 Mitchell (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 749, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2014-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2014-08-21SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4719.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2014-08-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2014-08-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 19. Page 6019.) Ordered to the Senate.
2014-08-11AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Page 5966.) Ordered to third reading.
2014-07-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (July 2).
2014-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-06-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2014-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 3649.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2014-05-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3441.) (May 12).
2014-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 12.
2014-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3311.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2014-03-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-03-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2014-02-27SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2014-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2014-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1010&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_bill_20140213_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_bill_20140317_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_bill_20140611_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_bill_20140811_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_bill_20140825_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_bill_20140928_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_vote_20140429_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_vote_20140512_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_vote_20140528_1200PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_vote_20140617_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_vote_20140617_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_vote_20140702_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_vote_20140814_1030AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1010_vote_20140821_0427PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback