CA SB1008 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 105296 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Childhood Lead Poisoning Prevention Act: online lead information registry.
Sponsors
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] |
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | March 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 105296 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1008 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1008 |