CA SB1008 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 933, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 933, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1363 and 1367.004 of, and to add Section 1363.04 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10112.26 of, and to add Section 10603.04 to, the Insurance Code, relating to dental services.
Title
Health insurance: dental services: reporting and disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1008 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1008 Skinner Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1008 Skinner (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1008 Skinner Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1008 Skinner (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 933, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 6126.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6962.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 4382.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4301.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 4851.) (April 25). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1363 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1363.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.013 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.255 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10603.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |