CA SB1006 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8.2 (commencing with Section 13874) to Title 6 of Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement: homeless outreach teams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3109.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13874 | New Code | See Bill Text |