CA SB1006 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 339 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational licensing: list.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code100036Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code339New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback