CA SB1005 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jun 27 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 13957 of the Government Code, relating to crime victims, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime victim compensation: relocation expenses: pet costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1005 Atkins et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4761.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4676.) (April 16).
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4515.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-06SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code13957Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback