CA SB1003 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 6 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3704 of, and to add Section 3702.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Respiratory therapy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1003 Roth et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 1003 Roth Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1003 Roth (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-06SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5164.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-07-05SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6108.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4875.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4588.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-28SenateApril 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code3702.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code3704Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback