CA SB100 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 11403.5 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extended foster care program working group.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2021-05-20SenateMay 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-04-20SenateApril 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2021-03-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 589.) (March 23).
2021-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2021-03-09SenateSet for hearing March 23.
2021-02-25SenateRe-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-11SenateRead first time.
2020-12-29SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 28.
2020-12-28SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11403.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback