CA SB10 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 65913.5 to the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning and zoning: housing development: density.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB10 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Assembly - SB 10 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Chiu (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB10 Wiener et al (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-16 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-03 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2021-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 2210.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-08-26SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-08-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 12. Page 2475.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-07-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-07-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 30).
2021-06-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2021-06-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22).
2021-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 1393.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-26SenateOrdered to second reading.
2021-05-26SenateRead third time and amended.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1178.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 895.) (April 22).
2021-04-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2021-03-22SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-03-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 552.) (March 18).
2021-02-24SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2021-02-24SenateSet for hearing March 18.
2021-01-28SenateReferral to Com. on E.Q. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on HOUSING, GOV. & F., and EQ.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65913.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB10
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB10#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB10#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB10#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB10#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB10#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB10#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB10#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB10#92AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB10#91AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB10#90ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB10#89CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB10

Bill Comments

feedback