CA SB10 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Motion to reconsider continued to August 31.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 5.6 (commencing with Section 11160) to Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter-approved local assessment: vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-22 - Assembly - SB 10 Leno Senate Third Reading By TORLAKSON (Y: 35 N: 29 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB10 Leno (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-23 Motion to reconsider continued to August 31.
2010-03-22 Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 29. Page 4365.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Torlakson.
2010-02-02 Read second time. To third reading.
2010-02-01 Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 45. Noes. 26. Page 3945.) Placed on second reading file.
2009-08-27 Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
2009-08-19 Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2009-07-08 Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-07-07 From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
2009-07-07 Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
2009-06-30 From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
2009-06-15 To Coms. on TRANS. and REV. & TAX.
2009-06-02 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2009-06-02 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1146.) To Assembly.
2009-05-28 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1066.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
2009-05-22 Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
2009-05-04 Placed on APPR suspense file.
2009-04-24 Set for hearing May 4.
2009-04-23 From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 638.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-17 Set for hearing April 22.
2009-04-15 From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 498.) Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2009-04-13 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2009-03-25 Set for hearing April 14.
2009-01-29 To Coms. on T. & H. and REV. & TAX.
2008-12-02 From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
2008-12-01 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_10&sess=0910&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20081201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20090413_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20090528_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20090708_amended_asm_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20090414_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20090422_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20090504_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20090528_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20090602_0127PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20090629_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20090706_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20100322_0538PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback