CA AR88 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4601.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4601.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to National Surveyors Week.
Title
Relative to National Surveyors Week.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Assembly - HR 88 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4601.). |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12). |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Introduced. |