CA AR84 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-16-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4230.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-16-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4230.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Read Across America Day.
Title
Relative to Read Across America Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 4230.). |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 27). |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. |