CA AR60 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3208.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to National Domestic Violence Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to National Domestic Violence Awareness Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - HR 60 Blanca Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-09AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3208.).
2019-09-05AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 5).
2019-08-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-08-26AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback