CA AR56 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-15-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2520.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-15-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2520.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to public health.
Title
Relative to public health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Assembly - HR 56 Levine Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2520.). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Introduced. |