CA AR55 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-16-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Measure version as revised on August 19 corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-16-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Measure version as revised on August 19 corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Native American Day.
Title
Relative to California Native American Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Assembly | Measure version as revised on August 19 corrected. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 2743.). |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Introduced. |