CA AR51 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2034.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2034.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ+) Pride Month.
Title
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ+) Pride Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 2034.). |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Introduced. |