CA AR43 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-17)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Measure version as revised on June 27 corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the 69th anniversary of the Korean War.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the 69th anniversary of the Korean War.

Sponsors

Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Assembly - HR 43 Choi Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28AssemblyMeasure version as revised on June 27 corrected.
2019-06-27AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2458.).
2019-06-27AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2019-06-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-06-10AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback