CA AR41 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-3)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2391.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ) Pride Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ) Pride Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Page 2391.).
2019-06-24AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-24AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback