CA AR41 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2391.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2391.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ) Pride Month.
Title
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ) Pride Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 2391.). |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Introduced. |